California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1164 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2021

Enrolled

Bill September 2, 2022

Chaptered

Bill September 30, 2022

Amended

Bill May 23, 2022
Bill May 4, 2021
Bill March 22, 2021