|
10/04/2021
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 452, Statutes of 2021.
|
|
|
|
10/04/2021
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/20/2021
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2021
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2997.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2021
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2494.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/02/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2021
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2021
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 26).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2021
|
In committee: Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/15/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/14/2021
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 13).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2021
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2021
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1656.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 19).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 97.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2021
|
From Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2021
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 4).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/08/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/05/2021
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/04/2021
|
Referred to Coms. on P. & C.P. and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2021
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/20/2021
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2021
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|