California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1221 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2021

Enrolled

Bill September 14, 2021

Chaptered

Bill October 4, 2021

Amended

Bill September 1, 2021
Bill August 26, 2021
Bill July 15, 2021
Bill May 5, 2021
Bill April 5, 2021