Senate
|
08/22/2022
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Limón.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2022
|
In committee: Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2022
|
Referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2022
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/31/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 3439.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/24/2022
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/20/2022
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (January 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/11/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (January 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/04/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/03/2022
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/04/2021
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2021
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/20/2021
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2021
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|