Assembly
|
09/29/2022
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2022
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2022
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2022
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 5362.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2022
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/08/2022
|
In committee: Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2022
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (January 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/03/2022
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/13/2021
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2021
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2021
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2021
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/10/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 63. Noes 0. Page 1361.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 5).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2021
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/04/2021
|
Referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2021
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/20/2021
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2021
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|