California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1262 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2021

Enrolled

Bill September 2, 2022

Amended

Bill August 25, 2022
Bill August 1, 2022
Bill January 3, 2022
Bill June 29, 2021