|
09/16/2022
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 337, Statutes of 2022.
|
|
|
|
09/16/2022
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/12/2022
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2022
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 52. Noes 18.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2022
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 10. Page 5380.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2022
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2022
|
Withdrawn from committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2022
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2022
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2022
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2021
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2021
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1656.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 19).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/26/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/25/2021
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W.,P., & W. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/25/2021
|
Referred to Com. on W.,P., & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2021
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/20/2021
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2021
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|