California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1279 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2021

Enrolled

Bill September 2, 2022

Chaptered

Bill September 16, 2022

Amended

Bill August 28, 2022
Bill June 13, 2022
Bill March 25, 2021