|
09/27/2022
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 555, Statutes of 2022.
|
|
|
|
09/27/2022
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2022
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2022
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 66. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2022
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 7. Page 5197.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2022
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2022
|
In committee: Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2022
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2022
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (June 8).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2022
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2022
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2022
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2022
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/27/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 59. Noes 0. Page 3406.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/20/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (January 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/20/2022
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2021
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2021
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2021
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (April 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/07/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (April 6). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/26/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/25/2021
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/25/2021
|
Referred to Coms. on B. & P. and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2021
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/20/2021
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2021
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|