California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1287 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2021

Enrolled

Bill September 1, 2022

Chaptered

Bill September 27, 2022

Amended

Bill August 24, 2022
Bill June 13, 2022
Bill May 23, 2022
Bill April 21, 2021
Bill March 25, 2021