|
09/24/2021
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 304, Statutes of 2021.
|
|
|
|
09/24/2021
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2021
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2021
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2636.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2021
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 58. Noes 17. Page 2625.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2021
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 2 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2240.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2021
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/13/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/06/2021
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2021
|
Referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2021
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1403.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 5).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/16/2021
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/14/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/13/2021
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P.E. & R. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/18/2021
|
Referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2021
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/20/2021
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2021
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|