California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1293 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2021

Enrolled

Bill September 3, 2021

Chaptered

Bill September 24, 2021

Amended

Bill July 6, 2021
Bill April 13, 2021
Bill April 7, 2021
Bill March 18, 2021