|
09/23/2022
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 476, Statutes of 2022.
|
|
|
|
09/23/2022
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2022
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2022
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2022
|
From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 29).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on E.M. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2022
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 27 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 5126.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2022
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/08/2022
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2022
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/27/2022
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2022
|
Withdrawn from committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2022
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on M. & V.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2021
|
Referred to Com. on M. & V.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2021
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1339.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/03/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 28).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2021
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/20/2021
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2021
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|