California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1314 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2021

Enrolled

Bill September 1, 2022

Chaptered

Bill September 23, 2022

Amended

Bill August 15, 2022
Bill August 1, 2022
Bill June 20, 2022