|
10/01/2021
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 444, Statutes of 2021.
|
|
|
|
10/01/2021
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/13/2021
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/07/2021
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 2849.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2021
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 5 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2392.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2021
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 26).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/15/2021
|
In committee: Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 1717.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2021
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 15). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2021
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2021
|
Referred to Coms. on PUB. S., JUD. and APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2021
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1338.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/04/2021
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2021
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/20/2021
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2021
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|