Assembly
|
06/03/2021
|
Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 36. Noes 28. Page 1908.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/03/2021
|
Reconsideration granted. (Page 1904.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2021
|
Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Friedman.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2021
|
Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 36. Noes 21. Page 1861.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2021
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2021
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2021
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2021
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (April 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/14/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (April 14). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/08/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/07/2021
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/25/2021
|
Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2021
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/20/2021
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2021
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|