California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1371 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2021

Amended

Bill May 24, 2021
Bill April 21, 2021
Bill April 7, 2021
Bill March 25, 2021