California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1390 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2021

Enrolled

Bill September 14, 2021

Chaptered

Bill October 8, 2021

Amended

Bill August 26, 2021
Bill June 30, 2021
Bill April 19, 2021