Assembly
|
02/10/2022
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/03/2022
|
Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
10/04/2021
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/15/2021
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2021
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2925.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2021
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 59. Noes 17. Page 2875.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/07/2021
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 9 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/07/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2457.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2021
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 26).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2021
|
In committee: Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/15/2021
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/08/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2021
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HOUSING.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2021
|
Referred to Com. on HOUSING.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2021
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1616.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2021
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/03/2021
|
Received by the Desk April 30 pursuant to Joint Rule 61(a)(2).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/03/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/11/2021
|
Referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2021
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/20/2021
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2021
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|