California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1423 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2021

Enrolled

Bill September 10, 2021

Amended

Bill August 30, 2021
Bill July 15, 2021
Bill June 30, 2021