|
09/29/2021
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 399, Statutes of 2021.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2021
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2021
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2021
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2652.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2021
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 58. Noes 17. Page 2625.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2021
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 2 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2240.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2021
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/14/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/08/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/07/2021
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 7).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2021
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2021
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1741.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2021
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/10/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2021
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/22/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/18/2021
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/18/2021
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2021
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/20/2021
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2021
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|