California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1443 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2021

Enrolled

Bill September 3, 2021

Chaptered

Bill September 29, 2021

Amended

Bill July 8, 2021
Bill May 6, 2021
Bill March 18, 2021