California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1491 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2021

Enrolled

Bill August 26, 2022

Chaptered

Bill September 25, 2022

Amended

Bill August 11, 2022
Bill June 2, 2022
Bill May 18, 2022
Bill March 30, 2021
Bill March 25, 2021