|
10/09/2021
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 754, Statutes of 2021.
|
|
|
|
10/09/2021
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2021
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/02/2021
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/02/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 11. Page 2360.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 26).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/15/2021
|
In committee: Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 1695.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2021
|
Referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2021
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 61. Noes 16. Page 1814.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2021
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1577.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (April 28).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/15/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/11/2021
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P.E. & R. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/11/2021
|
Referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2021
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/20/2021
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2021
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|