California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1550 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2021

Enrolled

Bill September 7, 2021

Chaptered

Bill October 9, 2021

Amended

Bill May 27, 2021
Bill March 11, 2021