|
09/28/2022
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 637, Statutes of 2022.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2022
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2022
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2022
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5011.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/08/2022
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/08/2022
|
From Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/02/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2022
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 31). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2022
|
Referred to Coms. on HOUSING and GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2022
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/27/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 61. Noes 0. Page 3410.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/20/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (January 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/14/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/13/2022
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/12/2022
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (January 12).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/12/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (January 12). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/03/2022
|
(pending re-refer to Com. on L. GOV.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/03/2022
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3186.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/03/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/03/2022
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/11/2021
|
Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2021
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/20/2021
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2021
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|