California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1551 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2021

Enrolled

Bill August 25, 2022

Chaptered

Bill September 28, 2022

Amended

Bill January 13, 2022
Bill January 3, 2022
Bill March 11, 2021