|
10/09/2021
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 755, Statutes of 2021.
|
|
|
|
10/09/2021
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/13/2021
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/07/2021
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 2838.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/02/2021
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 4 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/02/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2348.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2021
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2021
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2021
|
From Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/15/2021
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2021
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 1720.) (June 29).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2021
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2021
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2021
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2021
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1338.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 28).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/14/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/11/2021
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/05/2021
|
From printer. May be heard in committee April 4.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/04/2021
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|