California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1570 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 4, 2021

Enrolled

Bill September 9, 2021

Chaptered

Bill October 9, 2021

Amended

Bill August 30, 2021
Bill June 30, 2021
Bill June 3, 2021