|
09/16/2021
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 181, Statutes of 2021.
|
|
|
|
09/16/2021
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2021
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2021
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2638.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2021
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 58. Noes 17. Page 2625.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2021
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 2 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2246.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2021
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2021
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2021
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2021
|
Action rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, passed, and to Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/08/2021
|
In Senate. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/08/2021
|
Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/08/2021
|
Withdrawn from Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/05/2021
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/05/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1805.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 21).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2021
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2021
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1253.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 21).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/14/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/05/2021
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/12/2021
|
From printer. May be heard in committee April 11.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/11/2021
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|