California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1585 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 11, 2021

Enrolled

Bill September 3, 2021

Chaptered

Bill September 16, 2021

Amended

Bill August 18, 2021
Bill April 5, 2021