|
08/26/2022
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 174, Statutes of 2022.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2022
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2022
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2022
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5809.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2022
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 10 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/08/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4679.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/02/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2022
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2022
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2022
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 28).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on M. & V.A. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 8). Re-referred to Com. on M. & V.A.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2022
|
Action rescinded whereby the bill was referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2022
|
Referred to Coms. on ED., M. & V.A. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2022
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 4703.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/07/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on M. & V.A. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/05/2022
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/01/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (March 1). Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/23/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2022
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/20/2022
|
Referred to Coms. on HIGHER ED. and P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/13/2022
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 12.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/12/2022
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|