California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1633 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 12, 2022

Enrolled

Bill August 12, 2022

Chaptered

Bill August 26, 2022

Amended

Bill June 30, 2022
Bill April 5, 2022
Bill February 22, 2022