|
09/30/2022
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 859, Statutes of 2022.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2022
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2022
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2022
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 67. Noes 2.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2022
|
Assembly Rule 77(a) suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2022
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 27 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 5120.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/02/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2022
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2022
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2022
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 29).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2022
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2022
|
6-16-2022 hearing rescheduled by committee to 6-15-2022
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2022
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2022
|
Referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2022
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 55. Noes 2. Page 4571.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/24/2022
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/23/2022
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (March 21).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/20/2022
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/13/2022
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 12.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/12/2022
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|