California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1642 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 12, 2022

Enrolled

Bill August 30, 2022

Chaptered

Bill September 30, 2022

Amended

Bill June 30, 2022
Bill March 24, 2022