|
08/29/2022
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 202, Statutes of 2022.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2022
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2022
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2022
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5874.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2022
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 10 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/08/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4680.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/02/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2022
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2022
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2022
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2022
|
Referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2022
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2022
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 65. Noes 0. Page 4657.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 4).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/31/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/30/2022
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2022
|
Assembly Rule 47.1 invoked. (Flora).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/20/2022
|
Referred to Coms. on L. & E. and NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/13/2022
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 12.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/12/2022
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|