California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1644 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 12, 2022

Enrolled

Bill August 16, 2022

Chaptered

Bill August 29, 2022

Amended

Bill June 21, 2022
Bill March 30, 2022