|
08/29/2022
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 203, Statutes of 2022.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2022
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2022
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2022
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5815.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2022
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 10 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/08/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4685.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/03/2022
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 14).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2022
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2022
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2022
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2022
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/17/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 3878.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/10/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/09/2022
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/09/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 8).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/01/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/28/2022
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/25/2022
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 24.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/24/2022
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|