California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1682 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 24, 2022

Enrolled

Bill August 12, 2022

Chaptered

Bill August 29, 2022

Amended

Bill June 6, 2022
Bill February 28, 2022