|
09/23/2022
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 494, Statutes of 2022.
|
|
|
|
09/23/2022
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/12/2022
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2022
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 60. Noes 17.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2022
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 9. Page 5183.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2022
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/02/2022
|
In committee: Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2022
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2022
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 17.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2022
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2022
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 19).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/30/2022
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/16/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (March 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/08/2022
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 10.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/07/2022
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|