California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1803 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 7, 2022

Enrolled

Bill September 1, 2022

Chaptered

Bill September 23, 2022

Amended

Bill August 22, 2022
Bill May 19, 2022