California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1868 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 8, 2022

Enrolled

Bill August 26, 2022

Chaptered

Bill September 30, 2022

Amended

Bill June 21, 2022
Bill April 18, 2022
Bill March 22, 2022