|
09/30/2022
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 930, Statutes of 2022.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2022
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/13/2022
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2022
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2022
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 5368.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2022
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2022
|
Measure version as amended on August 25 corrected.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2022
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2022
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/02/2022
|
In committee: Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2022
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2022
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 22).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2022
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2022
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4971.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 19).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2022
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2022
|
Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/11/2022
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 13.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/10/2022
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|