California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1942 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 10, 2022

Enrolled

Bill September 2, 2022

Chaptered

Bill September 30, 2022

Amended

Bill August 25, 2022
Bill August 22, 2022
Bill June 28, 2022