|
08/15/2022
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 147, Statutes of 2022.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2022
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/04/2022
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/01/2022
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5706.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2022
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 29 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4574.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2022
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2022
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2022
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2022
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 68. Noes 0. Page 4370.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 6).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/22/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (March 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/15/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/11/2022
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/11/2022
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 13.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/10/2022
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|