California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1946 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 10, 2022

Enrolled

Bill August 2, 2022

Chaptered

Bill August 15, 2022

Amended

Bill June 6, 2022
Bill March 11, 2022