|
09/29/2022
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 767, Statutes of 2022.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2022
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/12/2022
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2022
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 64. Noes 9.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2022
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 5179.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2022
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/02/2022
|
In committee: Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2022
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2022
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 29).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L., P.E. & R. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2022
|
Referred to Coms. on JUD. and L., P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2022
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 59. Noes 9.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 3.) (May 19).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2022
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/31/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/30/2022
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/29/2022
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (March 29).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/17/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (March 16). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2022
|
Referred to Coms. on L. & E. and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/11/2022
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 13.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/10/2022
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|