California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1949 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 10, 2022

Enrolled

Bill September 1, 2022

Chaptered

Bill September 29, 2022

Amended

Bill August 16, 2022
Bill June 30, 2022
Bill March 30, 2022