|
08/26/2022
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 179, Statutes of 2022.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2022
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2022
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2022
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 5812.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2022
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 10 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/08/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4680.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/02/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2022
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2022
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2022
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 8).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2022
|
Referred to Coms. on ED. and HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2022
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 0. Page 4572.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/29/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2022
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2022
|
Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/11/2022
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 13.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/10/2022
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|