California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1963 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 10, 2022

Enrolled

Bill August 12, 2022

Chaptered

Bill August 26, 2022

Amended

Bill June 14, 2022
Bill March 28, 2022
Bill March 14, 2022
Bill March 7, 2022